Arti bhatnagar additional secretary
WebCommerce Secretary (Shri Sunil Barthwal) Dated 12.04.2024 Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser (Ms. Arti Bhatnagar) Additional Secretary (Shri L Satya Srinivas) Additional Secretary (Shri Amardeep Singh Bhatia) Additional Secretary (Shri Rajesh Agrawal) Finance, Budget & Accounts and Trade Finance. •Trade Intelligence and … Web20 mar 2024 · Additional PS to Minister of State (HI) Room No. 36-A, Udyog Bhawan, New Delhi: ... Ms. Arti Bhatnagar, IDAS. AS&FA. 121, Udyog Bhawan, New Delhi. ... arti[dot]bhatnagar[at]nic[dot]in. Dr. Hanif Qureshi, IPS. Joint Secretary . Room No.126-C, Udyog Bhawan,Rafi Marg, New Delhi-110011. 23062365 . 23062367 . …
Arti bhatnagar additional secretary
Did you know?
Web27 apr 2024 · Ms Arti Bhatnagar IDAS (1990) has been empanelled for holding Additional Secretary level post at the Centre by the Appointments Committee of the Cabinet . … [ … http://www.stclimited.co.in/content/board-directors
WebChairperson Smt. Arti Bhatnagar Additional Secretary & Financial Advisor, DPIIT, Ministry of Commerce & Industry, Govt. of India Member Sh. Ateesh Kumar Singh Joint Secretary, Ministry of MSME, Govt. of India Member Director, IIT Guwahati, Nominated by Dept. of Higher Education, Ministry of Education, Govt. of India Member Smt. Sunita Verma
Web21 gen 2024 · Ms. Arti Bhatnagar (IDAS:1990) was appointed as Additional Secretary & Financial Advisor (AS&FA), Ministry of Commerce & Industry. Presently, she in the cadre, Vikram Dev Dutt (IAS:1993:UT) was appointed as DG in the Directorate General of Civil Aviation (DGCA) by keeping the Recruitment Rules of the post in abeyance.. Web15 feb 2024 · Bharat Heavy Electricals (BHEL) announced the appointment of Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser (AS & FA), Ministry of Commerce & Industry (M/o C&I) as Part-time Official Director on the Board of BHEL w.e.f. 14 February 2024 in place of Shashank Priya, who ceased to be Director on the BHEL's Board w.e.f. …
WebThe State Trading Corporation of India Ltd. announced appointment of Ms. Arti Bhatnagar,Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser, Ministry of Commerce & Industry as a Director on the Board of... March 18, 2024
WebDesign Researcher at DHIS2, previously Obvious. A post-grad from the Young India Fellowship at Ashoka University, I am a problem solver and a designer of User … いしかわれんWeb6 gen 2024 · Aarti Bhatnagar is on Facebook. Join Facebook to connect with Aarti Bhatnagar and others you may know. Facebook gives people the power to share and … o\u0027neal parkWeb2 mar 2024 · Ms. Arti Bhatnagar has been appointed as Government Nominee Director on the Board of HMT Limited w.e.f. 14.02.2024. She is a Civil Servant of the Indian Defence … イシカワ 評判 悪いWeb30 mar 2024 · Bharat Heavy Electricals Limited announced that pursuant to communication from Ministry of Heavy Industries and approval of the Board of BHEL, Ms. Arti Bhatnagar, Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser (AS & FA), Ministry of Commerce & Industry (M/o C&I) has been appointed as Part-time Official Director on the Board of BHEL effective … o\u0027neal motorradhelm enduro adventure streetWebMs. Arti Bhatnagar Additional Secretary and Financial Adviser The Financial Adviser in the Ministry or Department of the Government of India dealing with the National Institute of Design, ex officio. Prof. Rama Shanker Verma Director (Officiating), Maulana Azad National Institute of Technology, Bhopal o\\u0027neal pinned spdWebMs. Arti Bhatnagar Additional Secretary & Financial Adviser Ministry of Commerce & Industry ... +91-11-23062756 [email protected]. View Profile. Shri Vijay Mittal Joint … いじか荘 じゃらんWeb25 apr 2024 · The Appointments Committee of the Cabinet, on Friday, has approved empanelment of the 14 officers from IA&AS, IDAS, IPS, IRPS, IRS, IOFS for holding … o\u0027neal property